Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 119)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 81-15
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 27 -6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
returned to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
taken from State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|