Senate | 04/04/2023 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 172) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | introduced in Senate |