House | 03/10/2023 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1) and (2) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
Senate | 02/24/2023 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | to Health Services (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | introduced in Senate |