Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 73)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 92-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 10, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
3rd reading, passed 30 -2 -1 with Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
to Licensing & Occupations (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|