House | 03/15/2023 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | introduced in Senate |