House
|
04/04/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 73)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 95-0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|