Senate | 03/01/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 94-4 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | introduced in House |