House | 04/09/2024 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 138) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | introduced in House |