Senate | 03/28/2024 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | introduced in House |