House
|
04/18/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 215)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Free Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Conference Committee report (1) filed in House and Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Conference Committee appointed in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate refused to recede from Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for receding from Senate Floor Amendment (2) for Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Conference Committee appointed in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House refused to concur in Senate Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Floor Amendment (1) withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|