House
|
04/05/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 86)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 92-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 06, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
to Local Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|