Senate | 03/12/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 79-14 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendments (1), (2) and (3) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | to Transportation (H) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | introduced in House |