House | 03/27/2024 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | to Health Services (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | introduced in House |