House
|
04/16/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 193)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 38-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 97-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|