House
|
04/09/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 125)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
passed 35-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Floor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
to Health Services (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 96-0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|