House | 04/06/2024 | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 113) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 32-6 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 75-19 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | introduced in House |