House | 03/27/2024 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | introduced in House |