Senate | 04/12/2024 | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 183) | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | passed 24-8 | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | to Rules (S) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | passed 80-18 | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | veto overridden | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | taken from Rules | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | to Rules (H) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | received in House | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Vetoed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 31-7 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 77-17 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | introduced in House |