Senate | 03/12/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 79-15 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | introduced in House |