House | 03/27/2024 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | to Local Government (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | introduced in House |