Senate | 03/08/2024 | to Health Services (S) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | to Health Services (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | introduced in House |