House | 04/04/2024 | signed by Governor (Acts Ch.40) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | delivered to Governor | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | to Agriculture (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | to Agriculture (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | introduced in House |