Senate | 03/14/2024 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 62-31 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | introduced in House |