Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 188)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 25-7
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 73-19
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
passed 71-18 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 71-17 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|