Senate | 03/11/2024 | to Education (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | 1st reading | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | introduced in House |