House
|
04/09/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 154)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
passed with 97-0 Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
returned to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
taken from Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|