Senate | 04/12/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | introduced in House |