House
|
04/05/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 108)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|