Senate | 04/12/2024 | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 189) | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | passed 26-7 | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | to Rules (S) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | passed 78-21 | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | veto overridden | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | taken from Rules | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | to Rules (H) | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | received in House | ||
House | 04/12/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Vetoed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | delivered to Governor | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 29-7 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | returned to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | taken from Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 75-20 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | returned to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | taken from Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | introduced in House |