Senate | 03/26/2024 | returned to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | taken from Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | 1st reading | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 76-20 | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | returned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | taken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | introduced in House |