House
|
04/17/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 195)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
passed 69-15
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 26-12 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
returned to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
taken from State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 66-30 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
to Health Services (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|