House
|
04/04/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch.43)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
passed 90-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
to Judiciary (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 92-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
to Judiciary (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|