Senate | 03/04/2024 | to Judiciary (S) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | received in Senate | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | to Judiciary (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | introduced in House |