Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 190)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 75-23
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
adopted 30-7
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Floor Amendment (1) defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
3rd reading, adopted 65-23 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (5)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
floor amendments (5) and (6) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
introduced in House
|
|
|