LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kentucky KY
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR83
Action History
KY
Kentucky House Bill HCR83
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kentucky 2024 Regular Session
Kentucky House Bill HCR83
Action History
House
03/21/2024
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
House
02/21/2024
2nd reading, to Rules
House
02/20/2024
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
House
02/15/2024
to Education (H)
House
02/12/2024
to Committee on Committees (H)
House
02/12/2024
introduced in House