House | 03/27/2024 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | to Families & Children (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | introduced in House |