Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky House Bill HJR119 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            UNOFFICIAL COPY  	24 RS BR 2353 
Page 1 of 2 
XXXX   2/26/2024 8:39 AM  	Jacketed 
A JOINT RESOLUTION designating a portion of Kentucky Route 1934 in 1 
Jefferson County as the Andrew and Charlotte Wade Memorial Highway. 2 
WHEREAS, Andrew Wade was born February 12, 1922, in Nashville, Tennessee; 3 
and 4 
WHEREAS, Charlotte Ann Williams Wade was born November 22, 1928, in 5 
Louisville, Kentucky; and  6 
WHEREAS, Andrew and Charlotte Wade were married in 1950, and Andrew Wade 7 
went on to serve in the United States Navy during the Korean War; and 8 
WHEREAS, upon returning home from service in the Korean War, Andrew Wade 9 
began work as an electric contractor and began searching for a home in Louisville for his 10 
family with his wife; and  11 
WHEREAS, Andrew and Charlotte Wade approached their friends Anne and Carl 12 
Braden with a plan to have the Braden's purchase a home in an all white segregated 13 
neighborhood in Shively, and then transfer the title to the Wades; and  14 
WHEREAS, in May of 1954, Andrew and Charlotte Wade moved into the home in 15 
Shively and found that the residents of the neighborhood were unwelcoming and openly 16 
hostile to living in the same neighborhood as a Black family; and  17 
WHEREAS, after the Wades moved into the home, just days after the landmark 18 
Supreme Court decision in the "Brown v. Board of Education" case, the house was shot 19 
at, a cross was burned in the yard, and bricks were thrown through the windows; and 20 
WHEREAS, on June 27, 1954, while Andrew and Charlotte Wade were out, the 21 
house was bombed; and 22 
WHEREAS, those who bombed the home of Andrew and Charlotte Wade were 23 
never brought to justice; and  24 
WHEREAS, Andrew and Charlotte Wade then moved to a traditionally Black 25 
neighborhood in the west end of Louisville; and 26 
WHEREAS, the terrorism perpetrated against Wades and the bombing of their 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	24 RS BR 2353 
Page 2 of 2 
XXXX   2/26/2024 8:39 AM  	Jacketed 
home became a rallying call and important moment for the civil rights movement and 1 
directly led to legislation such as the 1968 Fair Housing Act; and  2 
WHEREAS, Andrew Wade passed away on September 26, 2005, and Charlotte 3 
Wade passed away on January 11, 2020; and 4 
WHEREAS, Andrew and Charlotte Wade showed immense courage and tenacity 5 
when they moved into the all white segregated neighborhood of Shively in 1954, and 6 
their contribution to the civil rights movement and the history of Louisville deserves 7 
tangible recognition; 8 
NOW, THEREFORE, 9 
Be it resolved by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 10 
Section 1.   The Transportation Cabinet shall designate the portion of Kentucky 11 
Route 1934 in Jefferson County, from its intersection with Kentucky Route 1727 to its 12 
end at Wilson Avenue (mile point 11.5), as the "Andrew and Charlotte Wade Memorial 13 
Highway" and shall, within 30 days of the effective date of this Resolution, erect 14 
appropriate signs denoting this designation. 15