House | 02/15/2024 | to House Floor | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | to Education (H) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | introduced in House |