Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 119)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 92-1
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 11, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|