House
|
03/21/2024
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 7)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 72-12
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
returned to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
taken from Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 31-4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|