House | 03/06/2024 | to Health Services (H) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 32-0-1 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 01/05/2024 | to Health Services (S) | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | introduced in Senate |