House | 03/27/2024 | placed in the Orders of the Day | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from Rules | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | returned to State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | taken from State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | to State Government (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0-1 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | to State & Local Government (S) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | introduced in Senate |