House | 03/22/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | passed 29-8-1 with Floor Amendment (1) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Floor Amendment (3) defeated | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Floor Amendment (2) withdrawn | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | floor amendment (3) filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | floor amendment (2) filed | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | floor amendment (1) filed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | 2nd reading, to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | to Licensing & Occupations (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | introduced in Senate |