House
|
04/12/2024
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 172)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 61-36
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 27-11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
passed 57-37
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Floor Amendments (1), (2) and (3) defeated
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
floor amendment (3) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
floor amendment (2) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
taken from Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
returned to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
taken from Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 28-9-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|