Senate
|
04/07/2024
|
became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 115)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
to Enrollment (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 76-15
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 25, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
to State Government (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 26-8 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 04, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|