House
|
04/12/2024
|
delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 168)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 77-20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
passed 31-6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
veto overridden
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Vetoed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 83-12 with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
to State & Local Government (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|