Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 199)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
adopted 37-0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
to Rules (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
3rd reading, adopted with Committee Substitute (1) 85-7
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
placed in the Orders of the Day
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
taken from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
2nd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
returned to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
taken from Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
1st reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
to Education (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
3rd reading, adopted 28-9-1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
to Education (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
introduced in Senate
|
|
|