House | 03/27/2024 | returned to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | taken from Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | 2nd reading | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | 1st reading | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | to Committee on Committees (H) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | received in House | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | 3rd reading, passed 37-1 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | to Committee on Committees (S) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | introduced in Senate |