Kentucky 2024 Regular Session

Kentucky Senate Bill SR93 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            UNOFFICIAL COPY  	24 RS BR 1723 
Page 1 of 2 
XXXX   1/23/2024 1:49 PM  	Jacketed 
A RESOLUTION celebrating the 60th Anniversary of the civil rights movement 1 
and commemorative March on Frankfort. 2 
WHEREAS, on March 5, 1964, 10,000 people from southern states, led by Dr. 3 
Martin Luther King, Jr., marched on Frankfort, and on the steps of the Capitol, demanded 4 
legislation that would end segregation by making discrimination illegal; and 5 
WHEREAS, on July 2, 1964, President Lyndon B. Johnson signed Public Law 88-6 
352, the Civil Rights Act of 1964, prohibiting discrimination of all kinds based on race, 7 
color, religion, gender, or national origin; and 8 
WHEREAS, on January 27, 1966, Governor Edward T. Breathitt signed into law 9 
the Kentucky Civil Rights Act of 1966, the first civil rights law of any southern state, 10 
prohibiting discrimination in employment, public accommodations, and housing based on 11 
race, color, religion, or national origin, and hailed by Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. as "the 12 
strongest and most comprehensive civil rights bill passed by a southern state"; and 13 
WHEREAS, this year we celebrate the 60th Anniversary of the Civil Rights Act of 14 
1964, the most sweeping civil rights legislation since Reconstruction; and 15 
WHEREAS, on March 5, 2024, Kentuckians will March on Frankfort in celebration 16 
of Kentucky's historic role, which helped lead the nation and the states to end legal 17 
segregation and establish civil rights laws to make discrimination illegal; and 18 
WHEREAS, Kentuckians support equal opportunity, equal treatment, and justice in 19 
the Commonwealth of Kentucky, and are proud that this southern state leads the way for 20 
civil and human rights; 21 
NOW, THEREFORE, 22 
Be it resolved by the Senate of the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of 23 
Kentucky: 24 
Section 1.   The Senate stands united in celebration of the 60th Anniversary of 25 
the civil rights movement and the commemorative March on Frankfort. 26 
Section 2.   The Senate encourages all Kentuckians to celebrate the achievements 27  UNOFFICIAL COPY  	24 RS BR 1723 
Page 2 of 2 
XXXX   1/23/2024 1:49 PM  	Jacketed 
this great Commonwealth has made in the area of civil rights and to actively participate 1 
in this historic celebration. 2 
Section 3. The Clerk of the Senate is directed to deliver a copy of this 3 
Resolution to the Kentucky Commission on Human Rights, 332 West Broadway, Suite 4 
1400, Louisville, Kentucky 40202; NAACP, Louisville Branch, 1245 Catalpa Court, 5 
Louisville, Kentucky 40211; NAACP Lexington-Fayette County Branch, P.O. Box 6 
13655, Lexington, Kentucky 40583; Sen. Gerald A. Neal, and the members of the 7 
Kentucky Black Legislative Caucus. 8