House
|
03/31/2025
|
signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
passed 94-0
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2025
|
posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
to Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
received in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
2nd reading, to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
to Agriculture (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
received in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
3rd reading, passed 90-2
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2025
|
Floor Amendment (1) and Floor Amendment (2-title) withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 21, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
floor amendment (2-title) filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
floor amendment (1) filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
to Agriculture (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
to Committee on Committees (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/07/2025
|
introduced in House
|
|
|